HENDY AND DISTRICT AGE CONCERN

Charity number: 517703
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £1.58k £1.97k £1.67k £1.36k £1.05k
Total expenditure £1.62k £1.89k £1.87k £1.49k £1.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A