Trustees Dr Frost Learning

Charity number: 1194954
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carol Thornhill Trustee 12 October 2023
None on record
Claudia Brind-Woody Trustee 12 July 2023
None on record
Philipp Legner Trustee 09 May 2023
None on record
Maximilian Jagraj Purewal Trustee 03 October 2022
None on record
Alastair Ingall Trustee 24 June 2021
None on record
Kenneth Charles Batty Trustee 24 June 2021
Mosaic LGBT+ Young Persons' Trust
Received: On time
Archana Sarma Trustee 24 June 2021
None on record