I WAS BLIND BUT NOW I SEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 14 June 2021: CIO registration
- NO MORE BLIND (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Phyllis Linton | Chair |
|
|
|||||
TAFARI HENRY | Trustee | 04 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Street Feed | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 822 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 822 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH THE PROCLAMATION OF THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, ORGANISING OF LIVE AND/OR VIRTUAL EVENTS TO RAISE AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE, TEACHING MATERIALS (PRINTED AND DIGITAL) ON THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT JESUS CHRIST, AND MAKE THEM AWARE OF THE GOSPEL OF SALVATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 Princes Street
IPSWICH
IP1 1RJ
- Phone:
- 07957234791
- Email:
- info@nomoreblind.org
- Website:
-
nomoreblind.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window