Trustees HOSPICE OF ST MARY OF FURNESS

Charity number: 517738
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GRAHAM ARTHUR JOWETT Chair 18 December 2013
BOUTH VILLAGE HALL
Received: 45 days late
Rosalind Buchanan Trustee 01 December 2022
None on record
Jason Berry Trustee 22 November 2022
None on record
James Higgins Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
Andrew James Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Esther Kirby Trustee 26 May 2020
FIFTH SENSE
Received: On time
EVERY LIFE MATTERS
Received: On time
Alyson Dickson Trustee 26 May 2020
None on record
RICHARD BIRD Trustee 07 June 2016
None on record
Andrew Wren Trustee 07 June 2016
None on record
Graham Servante Trustee 24 November 2015
NRT
Received: On time
Dr Andrew Luksza Trustee 24 November 2015
None on record
DENISE HARDY Trustee 16 September 2014
LYMPHOEDEMA SUPPORT NETWORK
Received: On time