Trustees ST MARGARET'S NURSERY

Charity number: 1194058
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Catherine Perry Trustee 07 March 2023
None on record
Victoria Dean Lourenco Trustee 16 January 2023
None on record
Jayme Dunigan Trustee 24 May 2022
None on record
Kirsty Harper Trustee 11 April 2022
None on record
Lorna Willis Trustee 09 April 2021
ST MARGARET'S-AT-CLIFFE PARENTS, TEACHERS & FRIENDS ASSOCIATION
Overdue by 239 days