TRANSFORMATION ARENA LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OUR MAIN AIM IS TO USE THE WORD OF GOD TO CHANGE, IMPROVE AND MODIFY LIVES TO BE BETTER AND TO HELP BY WAY OF COUNSELLING WITH THE WORDS FROM THE BIBLE. TO CONTINUE OUR WORK IN UNITED KINGDOM AND NIGERIA
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Nigeria
Governance
- 08 June 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEORGE GEO-OBAROGIE | Chair | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul O'Brien Guthrie | Trustee | 04 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Suvi Kastehelmi Osayamen Geo-Obarogie | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.75k | £6.81k | £7.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.67k | £6.78k | £8.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2025 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 09 May 2023 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 09 May 2023 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGIOUS FAITH USING THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF GOSPEL PREACHING, PRAYER MEETINGS, WORSHIP SERVICES, HOSPITAL VISITATION AND COMMUNITY OUTREACH PROJECTS IN THE UNTIED KINGDOM AND WORLDWIDE; AND TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ON THE CHRISTIAN RELIGIOUS FAITH BY PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 21
Holroyd Business Centre
Carr Bottom Road
BRADFORD
West Yorkshire
BD5 9BP
- Phone:
- 07944633674
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window