BOOST UP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our objectives are to support young homeless Londoners to access housing, using capital to pay the deposit, rent in advance, top up fees and to act as a nonprofit guarantor.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 September 2021: CIO registration
- AGENCY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Safiya Rehman S.R | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Boakes A.B | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Binal Varsani B.V | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.00k | £27.96k | £64.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £27.40k | £41.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 30 Sep 2021 as amended on 10 Nov 2021 as amended on 07 Dec 2021 as amended on 27 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED, PRIMARILY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) TO ASSIST IN COVERING THE COSTS OF ACCOMMODATION, BASIC LIVING NECESSITIES AND ACTIVITIES DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELFSUFFICIENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
International House
109-111 Fulham Palace Road
LONDON
W6 8JA
- Phone:
- 00
- Website:
-
boost.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window