Financial history ROBERT OWEN COMMUNITIES

Charity number: 517845
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £6.43m £6.43m £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £6.56m £6.56m £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £6.34m £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £84.79k £84.79k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £6.34m £6.34m N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £5.22k £5.22k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £28.58k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.41m £6.41m N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £56.01k £56.01k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £87.62k £87.62k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £89.47k £89.47k N/A N/A N/A