WYBUNBURY TOWER PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 517869
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £7.97k £4.61k £22.51k £11.65k £10.46k
Total expenditure £3.30k £12.24k £6.15k £17.91k £32.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A