MATRIX CARE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Befriending, assistance with household chores, grocery shopping, collection of medication and benefits, respite sitting service for carers, hospital discharge support, support with housing repair reporting, form filling, accessing other services, provision of assistance to connect emergency utilities, purchasing essential household items such as white goods, bedding, curtains and crockery
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 December 2021: CIO registration
- MATRIX CARE GROUP INTERNATIONAL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Sackey | Chair | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Simeon Ayepah | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eva Osei-Kyeretwie | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: OPERATING WITHIN THE CHRISTIAN ETHOS, THE RELIEF OF THE ELDERLY AND PERSONS IN NEED BY REASON OF MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN LONDON THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SERVICES DESIGNED TO MEET AND RELIEVE THEIR NEEDS INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: BEFRIENDING, ASSISTANCE WITH HOUSEHOLD CHORES, GROCERY SHOPPING, COLLECTION OF MEDICATION AND BENEFITS, RESPITE SITTING SERVICE FOR CARERS, SUPPORT PRE AND POST HOSPITAL DISCHARGE, SUPPORT WITH HOUSING REPAIR REPORTING, FORM FILLING AND ACCESSING OTHER SERVICES AND THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO CONNECT EMERGENCY UTILITIES AND PURCHASE ESSENTIAL HOUSEHOLD ITEMS SUCH AS WHITE GOODS, BEDDING, CURTAINS AND CROCKERY.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 2, 15 Whitburn Road
LONDON
SE13 7UQ
- Phone:
- 07912887529
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window