Trustees BOURNE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1196062
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Raymond Harvey Dennis Chair 01 July 2011
None on record
Carolyn Claire Greig Trustee 01 October 2020
THE LINCOLNSHIRE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
CLIFFORD MARTIN GILLIS Trustee 11 August 2018
None on record
NICHOLAS JAMES LEGGE Trustee 01 November 2010
THE BOURNE UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Mieczyslaw Gregory CEJER JP Trustee 01 September 1992
STAMFORD AND BOURNE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
BOURNE ARTS AND COMMUNITY TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Andrea Jean Rushworth Trustee
None on record
Daniel Anthony William Day Trustee
None on record
Anthony Philip Everitt Trustee
None on record
Sarah Louise Haine Trustee
None on record
Mark Tupholme Trustee
None on record
DAVID JOHN BOWER Trustee
None on record