Trustees MEDWAY ASTHMA SELF HELP GROUP (MASH)
Charity number: 1196597

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr MARTIN FAREBROTHER | Chair | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Joy | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Stockey | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Whybrow | Trustee | 18 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH PENDER | Trustee | 14 January 2010 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.