Trustees ABERGAVENNY BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1194889

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Michael Ian Orsmond | Chair | 01 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Morris | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Isobel Mary Gilbertson | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Pamela Martin | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Mary Morgan | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Anne Irene Wilde | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Alison Jane O'Gorman | Trustee | 04 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Barbara Mary Watkins | Trustee | 04 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Laurence Anderson | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Huw Cole Morgan | Trustee | 09 March 2016 |
|
|||||
Mary ANDERSON | Trustee | 01 September 2008 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.