Trustees INTERNATIONAL EVALUATION ACADEMY
Charity number: 1197772

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Goldman | Chair | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ahmed Ag Aboubacrine CE | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrealisa Belzer CE | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nanthikesan Suppiramaniam CE | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hur Hassnain | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ziad Moussa | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Juha Ilari Uitto | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Weronika Bronislawa Felcis M.A. | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof Bagele Chilisa | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Donna Podems | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sonal ZAVERI | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.