Trustees RESTORED TO RESTORE
Charity number: 1196781
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADAM JAMES CARVER | Chair | 25 January 2006 |
|
|||||
Nigel Fawcett-Jones | Trustee | 30 January 2021 |
|
|||||
JOANNE LOUISE DIXON | Trustee | 10 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Margaret Elizabeth Upstone | Trustee | 13 January 2013 |
|
|||||
Nathan Horton | Trustee | 13 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
PHILLIP GEORGE AINGE | Trustee | 01 February 2001 |
|
|||||
PAUL GRAHAM HUBBARD | Trustee | 02 December 1996 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.