KINDERGARTEN FOR AKURALA (KFA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
KFA helps pre-school children in the village of Akurala, in the Southern Province of SriLanka. By funding the build of a new pre-school and contributing to the on-going running costs, we will provide the children with quality early years education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 24 June 2021: CIO registration
- KFA (Working name)
- KINDERGARTEN FOR AKURALA (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Theodore Mitchell | Trustee | 10 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Teagan Alexandra Clare Galloway | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Caroline Mitchell | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sean Benedict Cooper | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Blaise Ferrers Le Mesurier | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fionna Peisley | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
HERMIONE CELESTE MITCHELL | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.54k | £1.39k | £2.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.53k | £1.16k | £2.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN IN THE VILLAGE OF AKURALA, SRI LANKA, BY BUILDING A KINDERGARTEN FOR EARLY YEARS EDUCATION AND PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL GOODS, EQUIPMENT AND MATERIALS FOR THE KINDERGARTEN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 St withun Street
WINCHESTER
SO23 9JP
- Phone:
- 07733224835
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window