ELLESMERE PORT MASONIC HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF ELLESMERE PORT AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Wirral
Governance
- 10 January 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Gerrard Ireland | Chair | 10 January 2022 |
|
|||||
ROY ALFRED BRENNAN | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Harold Knapton | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Edward Thompson | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.05m | £61 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.86k | £645 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.05m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £172 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £4.86k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 08 May 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 08 May 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 Jan 2022 as amended on 30 May 2023
Charitable objects
1) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF ELLESMERE PORT AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE/HALL AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. 2) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE WHO ARE HOMELESS IN ELLESMERE PORT AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY: A) PROVIDING FINANCIAL AND PRACTICAL HELP TO ASSIST WITH LONG TERM HOMELESSNESS BY WAY OF GRANTS OR OTHER SUPPORT TO INDIVIDUALS AND TO ORGANISATIONS; B) ESTABLISHING A NEW VENUE IN THE VICINITY OF ELLESMERE PORT TO PROVIDE SELF-CATERING START UP ACCOMMODATION FOR HOMELESS PEOPLE AS SHORT-TERM ACCOMMODATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Aaron & Partners Llp
5-7 Grosvenor Court
Foregate Street
CHESTER
CH1 1HG
- Phone:
- 01244405555
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window