Governing document OLDHAM CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 518255
Up to date (83 days late)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 13/06/1983 AS AMENDED ON 12/05/1986 AS AMENDED ON 20/03/2000 AS AMENDED ON 25/06/2012 as amended on 24 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND OTHER RELATED ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.