Trustees KNIGHTON FREE CHURCH

Charity number: 1200788
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jonathan Barrett Trustee 16 May 2023
None on record
John Peter Smuts Trustee 01 February 2023
None on record
Peter Graves Trustee 15 November 2022
None on record
Joshua Simon Radford Trustee 21 October 2022
None on record
Richard Patrick Wright Bryan Trustee 21 October 2022
None on record
Christopher Don Trafford Trustee 12 October 2022
None on record