COMPASS EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
-Booster class session -Extension educational services -Adult Learning Provision -Informal youth coaching and mentoring -Advocacy of refugee and asylum seekers education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bolton
- Kenya
- Somalia
Governance
- 29 November 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abdirashid Ahmed | Chair | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rawda Farah | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Moulid Hujale | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.23k | £25.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.79k | £3.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE WHO ARE REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS IN BOLTON, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO: -PROVISION OF TRAINING SERVICES; -PROVISION OF HOMEWORK CLUB SESSIONS AND MENTORING FOR YOUNG PEOPLE; -PROVISION OF ADULT LITERACY SESSIONS; -PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL AWARENESS FORUMS. -TO PROMOTE RESEARCH ON BARRIERS TO REFUGEE EDUCATION AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS IN REFUGEE CAMPS IN KENYA AND IN INTERNALLY DISPLACED CAMPS (IDPS) IN SOMALIA IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO: -PROVISION OF TEACHING MATERIALS AND TEACHING AIDS; -PROVISION OF TRAINING TO SCHOOL TEACHERS; -PROVISION OF COMMUNITY EDUCATION AND TRAININGS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Salisbury Street
BOLTON
BL3 5DR
- Phone:
- 07479435350
- Email:
- compass.eduk@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window