TWO'S COMPANY KESWICK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Two's Company Keswick is a befriending scheme offered to lonely and/or social isolated adults in the Keswick and wider CA12 area. Fully trained and vetted volunteer befrienders are matched up with those referred into the scheme according to personality and interests.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £750 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 29 October 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Welton | Chair | 28 October 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Christine Wendy Morgan | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Keith Malcolm Rigg | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Rev Charles Henry Hope | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
John Robert Hayes | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/07/2022 | 01/07/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.35k | £5.65k | £8.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.68k | £5.74k | £7.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.25k | N/A | £750 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 July 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 July 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING ADULTS RESIDENT IN THE KESWICK CA12 POSTCODE AREA FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH: A) THE PROVISION OF A BEFRIENDING SERVICE DESIGNED TO SUPPORT AND ASSIST SUCH PERSONS. B) RECRUITING AND TRAINING VOLUNTEERS TO BE BEFRIENDERS, DEVELOPING UNDERSTANDING OF THE BEFRIENDER’S ROLE AND LIMITATIONS AND PROVIDING ONGOING SUPPORT. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF LONELINESS AND/OR SOCIAL ISOLATION DUE TO AGE OR ILL HEALTH AND THE ABSENCE OR LACK OF A STRONG SOCIAL SUPPORT NETWORK.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
BEECH BANK
BORROWDALE ROAD
KESWICK
CA12 5UP
- Phone:
- 07855333842
- Email:
- awwelton@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window