Accounts and annual returns INNER WHEEL CLUB OF BLACKBURN TRUST FUND

Charity number: 518352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 17 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 06 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 06 March 2021 310 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 23 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 13 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required