CHANGE AHEAD NON-PROFIT CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides relief of those in need throughout England who are homeless or facing homelessness, by making grants of money for providing or paying for housing deposits and/or rent, paying for items, social housing services, or facilities, in collaboration with partners. For sustainable housing solutions, the charity will own or lease buildings to relieve the needs of such persons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 July 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Simon Luketa | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
PHILIPPA HALLAM | Trustee | 16 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
BHAVIN SHAH | Trustee | 09 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.58k | £6.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.83k | £5.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED THROUGHOUT ENGLAND WHO ARE HOMELESS OR ROUGH SLEEPING OR FACING HOMELESSNESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR HOUSING DEPOSITS, ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHANGE AHEAD NON-PROFIT CHARITY
Office 2E
Argyle House
Joel Street
Northwood
HA6 1LL
- Phone:
- 03337723199
- Email:
- info@changeahead.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window