Governing document WAKEFIELD HOSPICE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION 17 JULY 1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 JUN 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 JAN 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 NOV 2018 as amended on 12 Dec 2022 as amended on 14 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE WELFARE OF THE TERMINALLY ILL IN THE AREA OF WAKEFIELD AND DISTRICT IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
WAKEFIELD AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.