SHEFFIELD VINEYARD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sheffield Vineyard is a Christian Church. We worship God in creative and relevant ways and we want to impact the people of Sheffield, and beyond, with compassion and generosity. We have Sunday morning services at Birkdale School in Sheffield, and hold numerous other ministries and events in various places across the city.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 19 January 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR ALEXANDER LESLIE GRIFFIN | Chair | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Kaye | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Higgins | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|||||
John Phillip Lea-Wilson | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karen Alison Griffin | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Emma Lambert | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.84k | £97.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.63k | £81.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO ATTACHED IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD THROUGH: - THE ORGANISATION AND PROVISION OF CHRISTIAN WORSHIP; - THE PROVISION OF SUCH FACILITIES AND SERVICES AS ARE APPROPRIATE FOR THE CHURCH, TO ENABLE IT TO FULFIL ITS MISSION TO THE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH, VISITORS TO THE CHURCH AND THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY; - THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR CHRISTIAN TRAINING AND SERVICE; - THE SUPPORT AND PROVISION OF CHRISTIAN EVANGELISM AND OUTREACH; - THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE TO THE WIDER CHRISTIAN CHURCH IN ITS MINISTRIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
80 BRINCLIFFE EDGE ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S11 9BW
- Phone:
- 01143033999
- Email:
- hello@sheffieldvineyard.org
- Website:
-
sheffieldvineyard.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window