Accounts and annual returns STRETTON CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL

Charity number: 518447
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 November 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required