ROCK PARK ESTATE

Charity number: 518573
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 17 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)