GLOBAL CHINA ACADEMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Global China Academy (GCA) is the only worldwide fellowship dedicated to Chinese-related studies. Led by its GCA fellows, it operates independently, publishing uncensored works on China through Global Century Press. The Academy provides a high-end platform for Global China Dialogue forums on global governance in all its aspects and also hosts occasional seminars.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Brazil
- Canada
- China
- Denmark
- Egypt
- France
- Germany
- Hong Kong
- India
- Italy
- Japan
- Jordan
- Netherlands
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Philippines
- Russia
- Scotland
- Singapore
- Taiwan
- United States
Governance
- 17 May 2022: CIO registration
- 26 June 2024: Funds received from 1154640 GLOBAL CHINA ACADEMY
- CCPN GLOBAL (Working name)
- GLOBAL CHINA INSTITUTE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Maria Jaschok | Chair | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Lee | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thomas Clarke | Trustee | 09 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Yuan Cheng | Trustee | 09 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles Grant | Trustee | 09 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Xiangqun Chang | Trustee | 09 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.58k | £35.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.81k | £37.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 May 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL (AND PARTICULARLY AMONGST SOCIAL SCIENTISTS) ON THE SUBJECT OF CHINESE SOCIAL SCIENCES AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF THAT SUBJECT, SPECIFICALLY THE PROMOTION OF CHINESE RESEARCH IDEAS IN THE WEST, AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS, ON TOPICS COMPARING CHINA WITH OTHER COUNTRIES AND REGIONS WITHIN ITS ASIAN AND GLOBAL CONTEXTS IN A HISTORICAL AND CONTEMPORARY MATRIX; AND COMPARING CHINESE PEOPLE OR THEIR THOUGHTS METHODOLOGICALLY AND THEORETICALLY WITHIN THE CONTEXT OF HUMAN KNOWLEDGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 HANKINS LANE
LONDON
NW7 3AG
- Phone:
- +442089068798
- Email:
- info@globalchinaacademy.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window