WHITLEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 518590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.11k £8.27k £9.37k £8.72k £12.85k
Total expenditure £8.48k £14.91k £9.34k £16.60k £13.99k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.50k