WHITLEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefit of inhabitants of Whitley and the neighbourhood without distinction of sex, political, religious or other opinions, by associating local authorities, voluntary organisations and inhabitants in a common effort to provide facilities of social welfare for recreation and leisure-time occupation with the objects of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kirklees
Governance
- 20 March 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER DEWAR ANGUS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Eleanor Hobson | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stewart John Abel | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Voyce | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Drury | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clare Torr | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Hutton | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Marsden | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Woodward | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marjorie Wheelhouse | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Anthony Smyth | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
AUDREY ELIZABETH WRAITHMELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.72k | £12.85k | £14.19k | £43.62k | £134.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.60k | £13.99k | £3.80k | £29.56k | £149.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.50k | £7.20k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 JANUARY 1986, AS AMENDED ON 29TH MARCH 2004 as amended on 13 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WHITLEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT') WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOICATION THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTALISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE CENTRE') AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE, OR TO CO-OPER WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF, SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY HE ASSOICATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
WHITLEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Community Centre
Howroyd Lane
Whitley
DEWSBURY
West Yorkshire
WF12 0NB
- Phone:
- 07717 876017
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window