THE MABOMBOH EDUCATION PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Mabomboh Education Project is, for the public benefit, to promote the education including social and physical training of children in the village of Mabomboh, including Providing education from pre-school to the end of primary school, in accordance with the national curriculum. Providing school buildings to be used as a venue for community activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 17 January 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Evelyn Lovetta Nenneh Maclean | Chair | 10 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev DUNCAN JOHN MACBEAN BA | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Ivan O'Brien-Coker Dr | Trustee | 10 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Iain Stewart Maclean | Trustee | 10 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.66k | £28.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.95k | £30.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGES IN THE VILLAGE OF MABOMBOH, SIERRA LEONE, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: A. PROVIDING EDUCATION FROM PRE-SCHOOL TO THE END OF HIGH SCHOOL, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE NATIONAL CURRICULUM, AVAILABLE TO ALL CHILDREN IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY B. PROVIDING SCHOOL BUILDINGS TO BE USED AS A VENUE FOR ADULT EDUCATION INCLUDING PARENTING SKILLS, CHILDCARE, NUTRITION, AND PLANNED PARENTHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 WIDECOMBE ROAD
LONDON
SE9 4HQ
- Phone:
- +447949539050
- Email:
- evelyn.maclean@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window