Trustees QUEENSCOURT HOSPICE
Charity number: 518801
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Damian Crewe | Chair | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Causer | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Appleton | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqui Campbell | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Kemp | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Hooton | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kim Bartrum Wallis | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Terry McGraw | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev PETER MARTIN ABRAMS | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Carol Bernard | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Geraldine Rose Boocock | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Christopher Paul Cutner | Trustee | 26 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET HELEN TARPEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.