Governing document THE LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 NOVEMBER 1985 AS AMENDED 11 MARCH 1987, 12 MARCH 1997,12 AUGUST 1998 AND 13 MARCH 2005. as amended on 24 Mar 2019 as amended on 12 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE PUBLIC STUDY OF FAMILY HISTORY, GENEALOGY, HERALDRY AND LOCAL HISTORY WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE HISTORIC COUNTIES OF LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND. 2) TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION, SECURITY AND ACCESSIBILITY OF ARCHIVAL MATERIAL.
Area of benefit
HISTORIC COUNTIES OF LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.