ABANDONED ANIMALS ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To rescue and rehome abandoned domestic animals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Conwy
- Denbighshire
- Flintshire
Governance
- 03 August 1987: Standard registration
- 27 March 2020: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 27 March 2020: Funds transferred to 515195 NORTH CLWYD ANIMAL RESCUE
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.85k | £172.71k | £165.66k | £396.03k | £73.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £146.57k | £154.13k | £172.76k | £196.09k | £201.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 16 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 16 January 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 04 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 04 June 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 27 February 2018 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 31 May 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 28 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 28 January 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/04/1987 AS AMENDED ON 13/06/1990 AS AMENDED ON 15/10/1990 AS AMENDED ON 27/02/1991 AS AMENDED ON 26/02/1997 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 13/05/2013 as amended on 11 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE CARE ACCOMODATION FOSTERING AND VETERINARY SERVICES WITHIN THE AREA OF NORTH WALES FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND PROTECTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS MALTREATMENT AND ABANDONMENT AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE CARE AND WELFARE OF ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
AREA OF NORTH WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window