NORTH YORKSHIRE HOSPICE CARE

Charity number: 518905
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.62m £4.88m £5.29m £5.56m £6.18m
Total expenditure £4.74m £4.94m £5.08m £5.36m £6.50m
Income from government contracts £767.11k £768.00k £0 N/A £1.38m
Income from government grants £0 £0 £955.91k £1.03m N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.90m £2.25m £2.37m £1.87m £2.20m
Income - Other trading activities £1.52m £1.52m £1.68m £1.88m £2.39m
Income - Charitable activities £1.19m £1.08m £1.23m £1.32m £1.54m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.03k £7.76k £812 £5.83k £16.36k
Income - Other £8.13k £20.25k £10.26k £485.43k £25.25k
Income - Legacies £764.29k £1.17m £956.01k £730.34k £484.31k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.59m £3.65m £3.52m £3.66m £4.20m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.15m £1.29m £1.56m £1.70m £2.31m
Expenditure - Governance £5.20k £0 £5.60k £0 £6.35k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0