NORTH YORKSHIRE HOSPICE CARE

Charity number: 518905
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER GIBSON Trustee 01 May 2016
HERRIOT HOSPICE HOMECARE Received: On time
LESLEY ROSEMARY BERS Chair
HERRIOT HOSPICE HOMECARE Received: On time
KAREN JANE WHEELDON Trustee 13 January 2012
HERRIOT HOSPICE HOMECARE Received: On time
MARK ROBINSON Trustee 13 January 2012 None on record
Darryn Hedges Trustee 11 March 2021
HERRIOT HOSPICE HOMECARE Received: On time
Victoria Ashley Trustee 30 November 2017
HERRIOT HOSPICE HOMECARE Received: On time
Andrew Wilson Trustee 09 September 2014 None on record
Catherine Ruth Walters Trustee 17 January 2017 None on record
Dr HILARY ENEVOLDSON Trustee 14 March 2013
HERRIOT HOSPICE HOMECARE Received: On time
COLIN JAMES TWEEDIE Trustee 13 January 2012
HERRIOT HOSPICE HOMECARE Received: On time