Financial history RADNORSHIRE WILDLIFE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 519021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £256.06k £363.69k £394.32k £510.65k £506.22k
Total expenditure £264.22k £293.57k £342.38k £283.80k £279.98k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £13.46k N/A £28.75k £135.53k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £402.87k £406.11k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £23.90k £13.99k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £67.75k £71.29k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £12.13k £12.11k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £4.00k £2.73k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £201.12k £64.85k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £276.21k £276.86k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £7.59k £3.12k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £7.85k £8.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0