LOGOS COMMUNITY CHURCH CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church Services, Sunday school, working with other local churches, supporting other Christian ministries. Sunday morning worship and small group fellowship meetings. Community lunch and bible study. Preaching, teaching, training, participation in local church network. Support of other Christian ministries, practical help and support of needy folk. Pastoral support of church members and others
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- Kenya
Governance
- 01 March 2022: CIO registration
- 29 May 2024: Funds received from 291679 LOGOS COMMUNITY CHURCH
- LOGOS COMMUNITY CHURCH (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIMOTHY SHARMAN | Chair | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Tanner | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charles Richard Atkinson | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Catherine Elizabeth Andrews | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian David Chilton | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.09k | £46.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.24k | £43.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN CLAUSE 30 AND THE WORSHIP OF GOD IN HAMPSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE BY ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER, INCLUDING THE PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL AND THE TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES AND THE PASTORAL CARE OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE AND THE PRINTING AND DISTRIBUTING OF THE BIBLE AND CHRISTIAN LITERATURE. FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK. FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ON THE BASIS OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, THE PROVISION OF SUCH EDUCATION IN ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT AND, IF THE TRUSTEES SO DECIDE, THE PROVISION OF ONE OF MORE CHARITABLE ESTABLISHMENTS FOR THE GENERAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OR ADULTS ON THE BASIS OF SUCH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CHURCH OFFICE
9 BEMISTERS LANE
GOSPORT
PO12 1HB
- Phone:
- 01329285271
- Email:
- admin@logoscc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window