WARWICKSHIRE WELFARE RIGHTS ADVICE SERVICE

Charity number: 519072
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/9/1986 AS AMENDED 7/12/1988, 23/5/1990, 19/1/1996, 16/7/2001, 14/7/2003, 14/7/2004 AND 27/9/2005.
Charitable objects
FOR THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN WARWICKSHIRE BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Organisation type
No information available
Registration history
  • 21 July 1987 : registered
  • 30 August 2006 : removed (CEASED TO EXIST)
Other names
  • WARWICKSHIRE WELFARE RIGHTS SERVICE (Previous name)
What the charity did
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helped
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helped
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information