THE SANCTUARY CHAPLAINCY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Sanctuary chaplaincy is a team of volunteer chaplains recruited and trained to provide chaplaincy in retail and other public spaces in the north Cheshire region, to retail staff and members of the public. We offer a pastoral listening ministry, signposting to appropriate services. Making available suitable literature, including Bibles. We also offer prayer as appropriate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 19 January 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deacon Timothy Coleman | Chair | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Heeley | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Knox | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £584 | £7 | |
|
Total expenditure | £161 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 10 June 2024 | 130 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 10 June 2024 | 130 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROVISION OF PASTORAL CARE AS AN EXPRESSION OF CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC WORKING IN, FREQUENTING OR VISITING RETAIL OUTLETS IN THE COUNTY OF CHESTER INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE RUNCORN SHOPPING CITY, HALTON AND INCLUDING THOSE WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM THE EFFECTS OF POVERTY, SICKNESS, DISABILITY, OLD AGE, ALCOHOLISM, DRUG ADDICTION, OFFENDING BEHAVIOUR, OR ANY OTHER MENTAL OR PHYSICAL INFIRMITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 Sandown Cresent
Cuddington
Northwich
Cheshire
CW8 2QN
- Phone:
- 07588468774
- Email:
- tim.coleman@methodist.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window