THE CHRISTADELPHIAN SUPPORT NETWORK UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support by phone and email to church members and families with personal difficulties including relationship, financial, workplace and mental health stresses
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 December 2021: CIO registration
- 31 July 2023: Funds received from 1075016 MORPETH CHRISTADELPHIAN ECCLESIA
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jean Baillie | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roy Dean | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gill Holden | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Cox | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Colin Briley | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Hilary Knight | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Gordon John Dawes | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Philip Cox | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anna Whittaker | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £20.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £20.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, INFORMATION ADVICE, SUPPORT, AND BY ANY OTHER MEANS THAT THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UK POST BOX
PO BOX 15113 PO BOX
BIRMINGHAM
B2 2NJ
- Phone:
- 07920446715
- Email:
- gordon.dawes@chsn.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window