THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WEST HUNTSPILL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer church services, baptisms, weddings, funerals and other church activities. The PCC are developing a community hub in a remodelled part of the church building offering community activities, links to community support organisations, group activities, IT hub, weekly cafe, also a daily Honesty cafe and toilet facilities for the use of all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Somerset
Governance
- 23 May 2022: Standard registration
- 25 April 2023: Funds received from 1040438 ILEX PARK
- WEST HUNTSPILL PCC. (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Christine Alison Judson | Chair | 29 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Blackmore Mrs | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Mary Hill | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Wiles | Trustee | 27 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Wall | Trustee | 29 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Keith Lemon | Trustee | 23 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Bronwen Francis Wright | Trustee | 23 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Ann Lemon | Trustee | 23 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Rose Roper | Trustee | 23 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richard Mark Tiley | Trustee | 22 April 2007 |
|
|
||||
Mark Saunders | Trustee | 12 April 2000 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Dennis Maddocks | Trustee | 10 April 1991 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £835.04k | £220.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £728.88k | £257.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £703.97k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £8.18k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £8.66k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £997 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £113.23k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £45.85k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.65k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £55 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £823 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £681.38k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1956
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HUNTSPILL RECTORY
CHURCH ROAD
WEST HUNTSPILL
HIGHBRIDGE
Somerset
TA9 3RN
- Phone:
- 01278781147
- Email:
- ehwhmchurch@outlook.com
- Website:
-
westhuntspillchurch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window