Trustees THE DROP IN - PORTLAND

Charity number: 1199273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Maria Smith Chair 12 November 2020
None on record
Natasha Scully Trustee 31 August 2023
None on record
Kathryn Helen Edwards Trustee 27 April 2023
None on record
Genevieve Emma Holmes Trustee 27 April 2023
None on record
Susan Patricia Cocking Trustee 27 April 2023
None on record
Gregory Edward Garnett Holman Trustee 22 April 2022
None on record
Nicola Jane Davidson Trustee 20 January 2022
None on record
Carol Callis Trustee 08 November 2017
THE DROP IN - PORTLAND
Received: On time
THE ISLAND OF PORTLAND HERITAGE TRUST
Received: On time