HOWGILL FAMILY CENTRE

Charity number: 519278
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 23 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 16 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 15 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 15 November 2016 On time Download