BELBROUGHTON CRICKET CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Cricket Club
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £1,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 21 April 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert John Hawk | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sir Malcolm Guthrie Bt | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Giles Malcolm Welcome Guthrie | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Charles Bartram | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.58k | £69.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.90k | £51.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.50k | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 02 January 2025 | 156 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 02 January 2025 | 156 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1.THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF CRICKET; AND 2.THE PROMOTION OF THE AMATEUR SPORT OF CRICKET BY PROVIDING COACHING AND DEVELOPMENT OPPORTUNITIES WITHIN THE SPORT FOR ALL WITHIN THE COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brent Eleigh
Hackmans Gate Lane
Belbroughton
Stourbridge
DY9 0DW
- Phone:
- 01562731062
- Email:
- mcg@brenteleigh.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window