THE CHAPEL AND SCHOOL ROOM, WOODHAM FERRERS

Charity number: 1197717
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are a chapel serving the community in a variety of ways. We run a Community Cafe including our toddler group, Food Pantry. We have services twice a month, host retreat days.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 January 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • WOODHAM FERRERS CONGREGATIONAL CHURCH (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Eric Peter Fenwick Chair 01 January 2022
CONGREGATIONAL FEDERATION
Received: On time
THE CONGREGATIONAL FEDERATION LIMITED
Received: On time
FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND CONVOCATION CHARITY
Received: On time
Alison Patricia Stokes Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Sara Adkins BA HONS Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Emma Hunnable Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Jane Baxter Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 08 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 08 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 17 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CHAPEL ROW
MAIN ROAD
WOODHAM FERRERS
CHELMSFORD
CM3 8RN
Phone:
07850118140
Website:

No information available