WINSLEY ACORNS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a small committee run village preschool in a rural community in Wiltshire, and have our own purpose built building on the primary school site. We offer care and learning for children ages 2-5 years during school term time, and normal school hours. We accept the 15 hours funding and 30 hours (income dependent) funding offered by the government, for those children over three years and also
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 26 January 2022: CIO registration
- 26 October 2023: Funds received from 1029827 WINSLEY ACORNS PRE-SCHOOL
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Clutterbuck | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Donna Marie Spence | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jay Palmer | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Sutherland | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Kershaw | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Forbes | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Strike | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £62.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £77.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 July 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 11 July 2024 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 September 2023 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 September 2023 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
3.0 OBJECTS THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: 3.1 OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; 3.2 ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; 3.3 INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO THE STATUTORY FRAMEWORK FOR THE EARLY YEARS FOUNDATION STAGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
WINSLEY ACORNS PRE SCHOOL
TYNING ROAD
WINSLEY
BRADFORD-ON-AVON
BA15 2JN
- Phone:
- 01225865131
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window