THE EVELYN GLENNIE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BY SUPPORTING THE DEVELOPMENT AND APPLICATION OF CURRICULA AND PRACTICES THAT ENHANCE COMMUNICATION SKILLS AND COGNITIVE DEVELOPMENT INCLUDING THROUGH WORKSHOPS AND TRAINING SESSIONS IN ACTIVE LISTENING, THROUGH THE USE OF MUSIC.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 January 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gethyn Williams | Chair | 21 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Debalok Biswas | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Isabell Henderson | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Peter Smith | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Stephen Boylan Drew | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Terence John Makewell | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon David Wheeler | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beti Margaret Jo Richardson | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Caroline Thompson | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Georgina Hughes | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dame Evelyn Elizabeth Ann Glennie | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
3.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BY SUPPORTING THE DEVELOPMENT AND APPLICATION OF CURRICULA AND PRACTICES THAT ENHANCE COMMUNICATION SKILLS AND COGNITIVE DEVELOPMENT INCLUDING THROUGH WORKSHOPS AND TRAINING SESSIONS IN ACTIVE LISTENING, THROUGH THE USE OF MUSIC. 3.2 TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WHO FACE CHALLENGES IN EFFECTIVE COMMUNICATION AND PARTICIPATION IN SOCIETY AS A RESULT OF DISABILITY OR OTHER PHYSIOLOGICAL OR PSYCHOLOGICAL CONDITIONS, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING OR SUPPORTING THE PROVISION OF TRAINING IN COMMUNICATION SKILLS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Evelyn Glennie Foundation
6 RAMSAY COURT
HINCHINGBROOKE BUSINESS PARK
KINGFISHER WAY
HUNTINGDON
PE29 6FY
- Phone:
- 01480459279
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window