DEMENTIA SUPPORT TRUST NORTH AND SOUTH MOLTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting people living with dementia and their families on North and South Molton
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 22 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 07 February 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harriet Hawkins | Chair | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Coles | Trustee | 15 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Hawkins | Trustee | 10 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 22/01/2023 | 22/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.49k | £1.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.48k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 22 January 2024 | 04 March 2025 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 January 2024 | 04 March 2025 | 102 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 22 January 2023 | 25 April 2024 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 January 2023 | 18 July 2024 | 239 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF DEMENTIA IN ENGLAND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION, ACTIVITIES AND PRACTICAL ADVICE. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO DEMENTIA THROUGH SUPPORT GROUPS AND TRAINING SESSIONS AS WELL AS FURTHERING THE KNOWLEDGE AND SKILLS OF CAREGIVERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WALTERS COTTAGE
EAST STREET
NORTH MOLTON
SOUTH MOLTON
EX36 3HU
- Phone:
- 07504660177
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window