ST THOMAS MORE HULL PTFA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity aims to advance the education of pupils at St Thomas More VC Academy in Hull in particular by engaging in activities, providing facilities and equipment to the support the school, as well as developing effective relationships between staff, parents and others.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 12 April 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Rosalie Robson | Chair | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marian Quinn | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Harrop | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Leech | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.85k | £5.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.49k | £8.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 NOV 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Thomas More Rc Primary School
St. Thomas More Road
HULL
HU4 7NP
- Phone:
- 07912882489
- Email:
- Stmhullptfa@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window